Berry v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: Connie Berry
Defendant: Brandon Davis, Fort Smith, City of, Fort Smith Board of Directors, City of and Fort Smith Arkansas Police Department, City of
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02269
Filed: November 7, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss, and Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Brandon Davis, individually, and the City of Fort Smith, Arkansas, remain. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 3, 2013. (lw)
July 12, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Extend and Enlarge Scheduling order, and granting 28 Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute Party to the extent that J.W. Berry is added as a plaintiff as Co-administrator of Eric Berry's estate. Discovery deadline is e xtended until 8/1/2013 and dispositive motion deadline is extended to 8/8/2013. This matter is removed from the 9/9/13 trial docket and reset for a Bench Trial during the week of 11/4/2013 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson.). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 12, 2013. (sh)
July 29, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Quash and the deposition notice is quashed. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 29, 2013. (sh)
August 1, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Jury Trial and this case is reset for a Jury Trial to begin on 11/4/2013 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson.). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 1, 2013. (sh)
December 2, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE and proceedings including the trial schedule to begin on Monday December 16, 2013, pending the Eight Circuit's ruling. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 2, 2013. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Berry v. Davis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Berry
Represented By: Chris W. Blankenship
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Smith, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Smith Board of Directors, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Smith Arkansas Police Department, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]