Janes, Inc et al v. Moates et al

Defendant: AIG Sun America Life Assurance Company, William J. Moates and Sun America Annuity and Life Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Janes, Inc and Loren Janes
Case Number: 2:2013cv02049
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER pursuant to Notice of dismissal 15 separate defendants, AIG Sun America Life Assurance Company and Sun America Annuity and Life Assurance Company ONLY, are dismissed without prejudice. On May 15, 2013. (sh)
July 12, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER re 29 granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint until 8/6/13, filed by National Planning Corporation, dated July 12, 2013. (sh)
October 16, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 41 Joint Motion to Hold Scheduling Order in Abeyance, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 16, 2013. (jas)
October 16, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Gunner Delay withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his/her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Refer to order for further court requirements and deadlines. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 16, 2013. (jas)
January 31, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying motions as moot 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; 50 Motion to Compel; 52 Motion to Continue and 53 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 31, 2014. (sh)
January 31, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendants and against Plaintiffs and case is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any appropriate motion for costs or fees must be filed by February 10, 2014, otherwise the parties are to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 31, 2014. (sh)
March 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER re 6 & 7 Stipulations to extend time to answer. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janes, Inc et al v. Moates et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Sun America Life Assurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Moates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun America Annuity and Life Assurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janes, Inc
Represented By: Joe D. Byars, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Janes
Represented By: Joe D. Byars, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]