Canaan Wildlife Preserve, Inc. et al v. Chesapeake Energy Corporation et al

Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas), Inc., Chesapeake Energy Marketing, Inc., Chesapeake Midstream Operating, LLC, Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Chesapeake Operating, Inc., BHP Billiton Marketing, Inc., Chesapeake Midstream Gas Services, LLC, BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville), LLC, BP America Production Company, BP Energy Company and Arkansas Midstream Gas Services Corp
Plaintiff: Joseph Flanagan, Billy C Looney, Willena Herman, Fred Herman, Siloam Minerals, LLC, Canaan Wildlife Preserve, Inc. and Janet K Speare
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02064
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting re 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by all Defendants. Defendants must file their responsive pleading by 4/22/2013. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 1, 2013. (sh) Modified on 4/1/2013 to add text (lw).
February 27, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motions 33 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; 36 to Dismiss; 36 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; 37 for More Definite Statement and adopting 49 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 27, 2014. (sh)
May 20, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 20, 2014. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Canaan Wildlife Preserve, Inc. et al v. Chesapeake Energy Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Arkansas), Inc.
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Adria Conklin
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Midstream Operating, LLC
Represented By: Adria Conklin
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: Adria Conklin
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating, Inc.
Represented By: Adria Conklin
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Midstream Gas Services, LLC
Represented By: Adria Conklin
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville), LLC
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Energy Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Midstream Gas Services Corp
Represented By: Adria Conklin
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Flanagan
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy C Looney
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willena Herman
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Herman
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siloam Minerals, LLC
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canaan Wildlife Preserve, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet K Speare
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: Mark A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]