Moore v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brent Moore
Case Number: 2:2013cv02092
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 17, 2014. (lw)
July 17, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Brent Moore against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company in the amount of $78,997.46 and interest at the rate of.11% per annum until paid. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 17, 2014. (lw)
November 1, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 1, 2013. (lw)
February 13, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Compel according to the rulings made by the court from the bench in the hearing 2/14/14; granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and discovery is extended to 2/28/14; and denying 36 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 13, 2014. (lw)
February 28, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 28, 2014. (lw)
March 4, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as set forth. Further this matter is hereby scheduled for a Pretrial Conference on 3/10/2014 10:00 AM followed by a Jury Trial beginning at 1:00 PM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 4, 2014. (lw)
March 10, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motions 55 and 57 , as set forth. Further, for the reasons stated on the record in this matter, the Court finds Plaintiffs claim pursuant to the Arkansas Deceptive Trade Practices Act should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 10, 2014. (lw)
April 29, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Brent Moore against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company in the amount of $171,997.46 and interest at the rate of.11% per annum until paid, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 29, 2014. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Randolph Charles Jackson
Represented By: Michael T. Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Moore
Represented By: Lucas Simon Gramlich
Represented By: Nathan Price Chaney
Represented By: Don P. Chaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]