Smith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: James F Smith
Case Number: 2:2013cv02114
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 19 Report and Recommendations in their entirety. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 23, 2014. (lw)
April 23, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 23, 2014. (lw)
August 22, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Report and Recommendations in their entirety and granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $4,096.50. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, any EAJA award by this Court should be made payable to plaintiff, but may be mailed to plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 22, 2014. (rw)
April 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service directing the Plaintiff to submit an amended IFP application providing more specific information regarding all his sources of income, and further directed to file his amended IFP application by May 10, 2013. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 26, 2013. (sh)
July 2, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 8 in toto and denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee of $400.00 by August 2, 2013. Should Plaintiff fail to comply by the deadline his complaint may be dismissed for failure to obey a court order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 2, 2013. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F Smith
Represented By: Matthew J. Ketcham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]