Stebbins v. Harp & Associates Real Estate Services

Defendant: Harp & Associates Real Estate Services
Plaintiff: David A. Stebbins
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv03078
Filed: September 9, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and denying plaintiff's 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 20, 2011. (rw)
September 26, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 26, 2012. (sh)
November 1, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 & 35 Motions to Compel as moot in view of the filing of the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 1, 2012. (rw)
January 2, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER adopting 40 Report and Recommendation in its entirety and denying as moot plaintiff's 45 Motion to Continue ; further granting defendant's 24 Motion to Dismiss and plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 2, 2013. (rw)
July 8, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 52 Motion to Disqualify Judge and DENYING 52 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 8, 2013. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas)
November 15, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE on Defendant and granting 21 days to answer from the date of service; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying as moot 3 Motion for Service. Further directing Clerk of Court to prepare and issue summons and USM 285 for Defendant and forward those documents to the USMS. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 15, 2011. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stebbins v. Harp & Associates Real Estate Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harp & Associates Real Estate Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Stebbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]