Taylor v. Midnight Express Books et al

Plaintiff: Kirell Taylor
Defendant: Midnight Express Books and Linda Huddleston
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv03128
Filed: December 7, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER finding that the interests of justice would best be served by transferring this case, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case immediately to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, Harrison Division. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/6/11. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 12/7/2011.]
April 11, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. The Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status pursuant to the prison Litigation Reform Act is hereby REVOKED, and Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's right to re-open the case with payment of the appropriate filing fee. Further any and all motions which remain pending are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 11, 2012. (lw)
February 7, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER denying 21 Request for Production of Documents filed by Kirell Taylor. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 7, 2013. Copy of order mailed to non CM/ECF participant. (jas)
July 9, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 24 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 9, 2013. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECT participant. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taylor v. Midnight Express Books et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirell Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midnight Express Books
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Huddleston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]