Croft et al v. Protomotive, Inc et al

Defendant: Todd Knighton, Cynthia Knighton, Protomotive, LLC and Protomotive, Inc
Plaintiff: Donna Croft, Bobbie Hickman and Benjamin Sutton
Case Number: 3:2012cv03102
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 7 Motion for TRO. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 24, 2012. (lw)
February 5, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER; granting 30 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 5, 2013. (lw)
May 13, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 13, 2013. (lw)
September 10, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to decertify collective action, as set forth. The case will proceed only upon the individual claims of Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 10, 2013. (lw)
December 10, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 10, 2013. ***Civil Case Terminated.(jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croft et al v. Protomotive, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Knighton
Represented By: Allen C. Dobson
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Knighton
Represented By: Allen C. Dobson
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protomotive, LLC
Represented By: Allen C. Dobson
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protomotive, Inc
Represented By: Allen C. Dobson
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Croft
Represented By: Amber Schubert
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Hickman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber Schubert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Sutton
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Amber Schubert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]