Basham et al v. American National County Mutual Ins Co et al

Defendant: Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Co. of TX, Metropolitan P & C Ins. Co., St. Paul Fire & Casualty Insurance Co., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Co., St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company, St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Co., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, St. Paul Protective Insurance Company, St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company, St. Paul Travelers Companies, Inc., St. Paul Travelers Group, St. Paul Travelers Insurance Companies, Travco Insurance Company, Travelers Auto Ins. Co. of New Jersey, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety of America, Travelers Casualty Company of CT, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Commercial Casualty Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Co., Travelers Home and Marine Ins. Co., Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Co. of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of CT, Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company, Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Co., Travelers of New Jersey Group, Travelers Personal Insurance Company, Travelers Personal Security Insurance Co., Travelers Property Casualty Co. of America, Travelers Property Casualty Corporation, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Co., Metropolitan Group Prop & Cas Ins Co., Metropolitan Direct P &C Ins. Co., Metropolitan General Insurance Company, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Co., Metlife Auto & Home, Metlife Auto & Home Group, 21st Century North American Ins. Co., 21st Century Centennial Ins. Co., 21st Century Insurance Group, 21st Century Insurance Company, 21st Century Ins. Co. of the Southwest, 21st Century Casualty Company, Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Royal Insurance Company of America, Royal Indemnity Company, Royal and Sunalliance USA, Royal and Sunalliance USA Insurance Pool, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Infinity Property & Casualty Corp., Farm Bureau Mutual Group, Infinity Specialty Insurance Co., Infinity Standard Insurance Co., Infinity Select Insurance Co., Infinity Safeguard Insurance Co., Infinity Security Insurance Co., Infinity Property & Casualty Group, Infinity Reserve Insurance Co., Infinity Premier Insurance Co., Infinity National Insurance Co., Infinity Preferred Insurance Co., Infinity Insurance Co., Infinity Assurance Insurance Co., Infinity Auto Insurance Co., Infinity Casualty Insurance Co., Infinity General Insurance Co., Infinity Indemnity Insurance Co., Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Co., Erie Indemnity Company, Erie Insurance Exchange, Erie Insurance Group, Erie Insurance Co., Erie Insurance Co. of New York, Pacific Property & Casualty Company, American National Property & Casualty Co., ANPAC Louisiana Insurance Company, American National Insurance Company, American National County Mutual Ins Co and American National General Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Eddie Basham and Freda McClendon
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv04005
Filed: January 17, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332caf
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay Responses to Multiple Defendants' Motions to Dismiss as set forth. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 26, 2012. (mfr)
September 6, 2012 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 104 MOTION TO REMAND AND REMANDING CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT OF MILLER COUNTY for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 6, 2012. (mfr)
October 23, 2013 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 104 MOTION to Remand; DENYING 212 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery in Support of Motion to Remand and VACATING 178 Order Remanding Case to State Court, filed by Freda McClendon, Eddie Basham. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 23, 2013. (mll)
November 14, 2013 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion to Stay. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 14, 2013. (mll)
December 10, 2013 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 236 MOTION Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule, because the Court requires more time to consider the motion, the current response deadlines are stayed until the Court rules on the motion. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 10, 2013. (lw)
January 31, 2014 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 247 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiffs' claims against American National Insurance Company are Dismissed. Party American National Insurance Company Terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 31, 2014. (mll)
February 18, 2014 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 229 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss Case; finding as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss; findi ng as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 39 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 49 Motion to Dismiss Case ; finding as moot 56 Motion to Dismiss Case. Defendants' answers or responsive pleadings to the Amended Complaint are due on or before February 24, 2014. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 18, 2014. (mll)
March 3, 2014 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 268 Motion to Dismiss Party; Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Royal and Sunalliance USA, Royal and Sunalliance USA Insurance Pool, Royal Indemnity Company and Royal Insurance Company of America terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 3, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Basham et al v. American National County Mutual Ins Co et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Lloyds Insurance Co. of TX
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan P & C Ins. Co.
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Medical Liability Insurance Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers Group
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers Insurance Companies
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travco Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Auto Ins. Co. of New Jersey
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety of America
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Company of CT
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Casualty Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Ins. Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Co. of America
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of CT
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers of New Jersey Group
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Personal Security Insurance Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Co. of America
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Floyd P. Bienstock
Represented By: P. Bruce Converse
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Mark F. Horning
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Group Prop & Cas Ins Co.
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Direct P &C Ins. Co.
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan General Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home Group
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century North American Ins. Co.
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Bill Cobb
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Ins. Co.
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Bill Cobb
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Insurance Group
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Bill Cobb
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Bill Cobb
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Ins. Co. of the Southwest
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Bill Cobb
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Casualty Company
Represented By: J. Dennis Chambers
Represented By: Bill Cobb
Represented By: Thomas Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Indemnity Company
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal and Sunalliance USA
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal and Sunalliance USA Insurance Pool
Represented By: Melissa Economy
Represented By: Alan Gilbert
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Property & Casualty Corp.
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Mutual Group
Represented By: Fletcher C. Alford
Represented By: J. Hawley Holman
Represented By: Ryan Polk
Represented By: Douglas A. Scullion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Standard Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Select Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Safeguard Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Security Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Property & Casualty Group
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Reserve Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Premier Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity National Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Preferred Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Assurance Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Auto Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity General Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Indemnity Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Taylor Marshall, II
Represented By: Peter H. Klee
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Represented By: Charles A. Danaher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Co.
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Indemnity Company
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Group
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Co.
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Co. of New York
Represented By: Dan F. Bufford, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fletcher
Represented By: Mark Stephen Breeding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property & Casualty Co.
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fletcher
Represented By: Mark Stephen Breeding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANPAC Louisiana Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fletcher
Represented By: Mark Stephen Breeding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: John A. Buckley, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National County Mutual Ins Co
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fletcher
Represented By: Mark Stephen Breeding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National General Insurance Co
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fletcher
Represented By: Mark Stephen Breeding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Basham
Represented By: Brad E. Seidel
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: Christopher R. Johnson
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda McClendon
Represented By: Brad E. Seidel
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: Christopher R. Johnson
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]