Moss et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Gay Cunningham Moss and Swan B. Moss, III
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2012cv04030
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying Plaintiffs' response time re 31 MOTION to Dismiss until further notice from the Court. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 15, 2014. (mll)
August 6, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss Party. Parties James B. Kozik (In his individual and official capacity), Norman L. Wagoner (In his individual and official capacity), James S. Watson (In his individual and official capacity), Gloria Maples Chrismer (In her individual and official capacity) and Susan K. Deimel (In her individual and official capacity) Terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 6, 2014. (mll)
September 26, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying the record pertaining to individual Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 26, 2014. (mll)
November 3, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending certain deadlines. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 31, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay Cunningham Moss
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swan B. Moss, III
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]