Mills et al v. Free Flow Spas et al

Plaintiff: Meredith Mills and Jack Mills
Defendant: Free Flow Spas, Balboa Water Group and John Does 1-10
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv04091
Filed: July 31, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Compel; denying 27 Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 27, 2013. (mll)
December 30, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Continue. The case is moved from the previous trial setting of April 14, 2014. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 30, 2013. (mll)
April 7, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss Party Free Flow Spas. Free Flow Spas terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 7, 2014. (mll)
September 17, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 17, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mills et al v. Free Flow Spas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Mills
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: Johnny Paul Arnold
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Mills
Represented By: Johnny Paul Arnold
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Flow Spas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balboa Water Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]