Clements et al v. DIRECTV, LLC

Defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Plaintiff: Anne Clements and Larry Clements
Case Number: 4:2013cv04048
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending deadline re 26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall have seven (7) days from the date the Court issues an order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration and to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 21, 2014. (mll)
February 27, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Withdraw. Mr. Jennings is relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. The law firm of Emerson Poynter LLP shall remain Plaintiffs' counsel of record. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 27, 2014. (mll)
February 27, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand; denying 12 Motion to Strike. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 27, 2014. (mll)
March 26, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay and to Compel Arbitration; denying 37 Motion to Certify. The matter is hereby stayed and administratively terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 26, 2014. (mll) Modified text on 3/26/2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements et al v. DIRECTV, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Represented By: Robyn E. Bladow
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Represented By: Melissa D. Ingalls
Represented By: Shaun Paisley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Clements
Represented By: Todd M. Turner
Represented By: Daniel Turner
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Clements
Represented By: Todd M. Turner
Represented By: Daniel Turner
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]