Taylor et al v. ANB Bancshares, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jan Taylor, Carla C Crosswhite and Laura T Godsey
Defendant: ANB Bancshares, Inc., ANB Financial, N.A., Plan Committee For Arkansas National Bank Employee Stock Ownership Plan, Daniel Dykema, Harry Brown, Gregrey D Landis, Debra Jackson, Eric Brown, Blake Evans and Vic Evans
 
Case Number: 5:2008cv05170
Filed: July 29, 2008
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Plan Committee For Arkansas National Bank Employee Stock Ownership Plan terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 14, 2010. (tg)
October 18, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 88 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Carla C Crosswhite, Jan Taylor, Laura T Godsey. Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 18, 2010. (tg)
November 4, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 Motion to Certify Class; adopting Report and Recommendations re 136 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 4, 2010. (tg)
July 14, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING 142 Motion for Settlement; ( Final Approval and Fairness Hearing set for 10/26/2011 10:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. All proceedings in the litigation, other than proceedin gs pursuant to the Settlement, shall be stayed. September 19, 2011 Bench Trial is Canceled. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 14, 2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Pendency and Settlement of Class Action Lawsuit, # 2 Exhibit 2 Court-Ordered Legal Notice) (src)
October 26, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 147 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 151 Motion for Settlement. See order regarding settlement instructions. The case is dismissed on the merits with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 26, 2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taylor et al v. ANB Bancshares, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Taylor
Represented By: Donald B. Kendall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla C Crosswhite
Represented By: Donald B. Kendall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura T Godsey
Represented By: Donald B. Kendall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANB Bancshares, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANB Financial, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plan Committee For Arkansas National Bank Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dykema
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregrey D Landis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]