Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP v. Myers Supply, Inc.

Plaintiff: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP
Defendant: Myers Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2008cv06086
Filed: September 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 29, 2008. (dmc)
January 7, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION to Dismiss or to Stay Proceedings filed by Myers Supply, Inc.. Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 7, 2009. (dmc)
January 21, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations in its entirety re 34 Report and Recommendations.; denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 21, 2009. (dmc)
February 3, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 35 Report and Recommendations.; denying 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 3, 2009. (dmc)
June 26, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP, denying 64 Motion to Strike filed by Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP, granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Myers Supply, Inc. for reasons set forth in this order. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 26, 2009. (cap)
July 23, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 23, 2009. (dmc)
July 23, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the matter is dismissed with prejudice with statutory costs to Myers Supply. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 23, 2009. (dmc)
August 19, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Attorney Fees granting in part and denying in part Motion 93 in favor of Myers Supply, Inc. against Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP. The court disallows $732.77 of Myers' Bill of Costs and awards Myers Supply costs of $6,920.11. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 19, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP v. Myers Supply, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Product LP
Represented By: Samuel E. Ledbetter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myers Supply, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]