JEFFERIES v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al

Defendant: PEACE ABODE, D.C. FIRE AND EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT, NATIONAL COMPANY ROMARM, JANE DOE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT GRAY, DEPARTMENT OF YOUTH REHABILITATION SERVICES, DC METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, OFFICE OF ASSISTANT U.S. ATTORNEY, D.C. OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, YOUTH SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, DIVISION OF COURT AND COMMUNITY PROGRAMS, COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, D.C. PRETRIAL SERVICES AGENCY, D.C. DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH, JOHN DOE, DC CRIMINAL JUSTICE COORDINATING COUNCIL, D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY, D.C. PUBLIC SCHOOLS, JUSTICE GRANTS ADMINISTRATION and PEACEOHOLICS
Plaintiff: NARDYNE JEFFERIES
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01159
Filed: June 23, 2011
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Beryl A. Howell
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Petition for Removal- Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION providing the Court's reasoning as to 32 , the Order granting in part and denying in part 22 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/7/2013. (lcrcl4)
January 8, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER dismissing, sua sponte, all claims against defendants Romanian National Company ROMARM S.A. and Vasile Marius Crisan with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/8/2013. (lcrcl4)
February 19, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE plaintiff's claims against defendant Cathy Lanier; plaintiff's request for punitive damages from defendant District of Columbia; plaintiff's claims against defendant District of Co lumbia under Counts One, Four, Six, and Seven; and plaintiff's claims against defendant District of Columbia under Counts Two, Three, and Fourteen that do not relate to the alleged affirmative negligence of ambulance operators. The Court, pursua nt to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c), REMANDS this matter for further proceedings to the District of Columbia Superior Court. The Court ORDERS that its 1/7/13 Order holding discovery in abeyance 32 shall be lifted upon remand. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/19/2013. (lcrcl4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JEFFERIES v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEACE ABODE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. FIRE AND EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL COMPANY ROMARM
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT GRAY
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF YOUTH REHABILITATION SERVICES
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF ASSISTANT U.S. ATTORNEY
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, YOUTH SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, DIVISION OF COURT AND COMMUNITY PROGRAMS
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURT SERVICES AND OFFENDER SUPERVISION AGENCY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. PRETRIAL SERVICES AGENCY
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC CRIMINAL JUSTICE COORDINATING COUNCIL
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTICE GRANTS ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Steven J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEACEOHOLICS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NARDYNE JEFFERIES
Represented By: John F. Mercer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]