Eastern Property Development LLC et al v. Gill

Plaintiff: Eastern Property Development LLC and South East Enterprise Group LLC
Defendant: Loren C Gill
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00062
Filed: June 15, 2011
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 138 Featured Case ORDER granting in part, deferring ruling in part on 122 Motion to Stay/Motion for Remittitur; finding as moot 131 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 132 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 133 Application for Writ of Garnishment; finding as moot 134 Motion to Quash. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 11/26/2012. (CGC)
December 12, 2012 139 Featured Case ORDER denying 118 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 122 Motion for Remittitur. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 12/12/2012. (CGC)
January 9, 2013 142 Featured Case ORDER granting 140 Motion for Reconsideration re 139 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Stay. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 01/09/2013. (CGC)
December 27, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Joinder. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 12/27/2011. (CGC)
April 16, 2012 73 Featured Case ORDER construing 65 Motion for Reconsideration as a Motion to Dismiss the Trust Counterclaims and granting the Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; denying 46 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 04/16/2012. (CGC)
April 24, 2012 74 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 04/24/2012. (CGC)
July 13, 2012 81 Featured Case ORDER denying 75 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 76 Motion for Sanctions.Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 07/13/2012. (CGC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Eastern Property Development LLC et al v. Gill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastern Property Development LLC
Represented By: James Cale Rogers
Represented By: John J E Markham, II
Represented By: Robert W Chambers, III
Represented By: Bridget A Zerner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South East Enterprise Group LLC
Represented By: Robert W Chambers, III
Represented By: John J E Markham, II
Represented By: James Cale Rogers
Represented By: Bridget A Zerner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren C Gill
Represented By: Ryan David Dixon
Represented By: Thomas C. James, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]