Bank of the Ozarks v. Arco Community Outreach Coalition, Inc. et al

Defendant: Susan Wainwright, Arco Community Outreach Coalition, Inc., Joseph N. McDonough, John M. Ford, Mary Helen Moses and Laura Cross
Plaintiff: Bank of the Ozarks
Case Number: 2:2012cv00017
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Referring Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying 59 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 74 McDonough and Wainwright's Converted Motion for Summary Judgment and 107 Staying claims against Defendant Ford as a result of his Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/15/2013. (csr)
August 20, 2013 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 112 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 121 Motion to Strike. Bank of the Ozark's claims against Defendant Ford who is subject to an automatic stay in bankruptcy remain pending. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/20/2013. (csr)
May 10, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Strike Defenses of Moses. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 5/10/2012. (csr)
May 15, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Strike Defenses of Cross. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 5/15/2012. (csr)
May 31, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike Defenses of McDonough. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 5/31/2012. (csr)
May 31, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Strike Defenses of Wainwright. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 5/31/2012. (csr)
July 5, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Strike Defenses of John Ford. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 7/5/2012. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the Ozarks v. Arco Community Outreach Coalition, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Wainwright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arco Community Outreach Coalition, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N. McDonough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Ford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Helen Moses
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Cross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the Ozarks
Represented By: Charles J. Bowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]