Gerwald v. GMAC Mortgage

Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Plaintiff: Anaissa Beth Gerwald
Case Number: 4:2012cv00066
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Bulloch
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that plaintiff show cause within fourten days of this Order why this case should not be dismissed for lying about her financial status. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/13/2012. (loh)
October 3, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re dismissing this case without prejudice 1 Complaint filed by Anaissa Beth Gerwald. Objections to R&R due by 10/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/3/2012. (loh)
October 3, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/3/2012. (loh)
October 10, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations; dismissing as moot 17 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/10/2012. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerwald v. GMAC Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anaissa Beth Gerwald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]