Terrell v. United States of America

Petitioner: Kenneth Terrell
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2013cv00067
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Kenneth Terrell. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/20/2013. (loh)
February 28, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 9 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/28/14. (wwp)
March 25, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Court directs respondent to file an answer or response within thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/25/2013. (loh)
August 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Kenneth Terrell. Petitioner's in forma pauperis status on appeal should likewise be denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/20/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrell v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Terrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]