Jones v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Barry L. Jones
Case Number: 4:2013cv00073
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that counsel for the parties submit briefs. Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, plaintiff shall serve and file a brief setting forth all errors which plaintiff contends entitle the plaintiff to relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/2/13. (wwp)
April 29, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing with prejudice re 1 Complaint filed by Barry L. Jones. Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/29/2014. (loh)
April 29, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Barry L. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/29/2013. (loh)
June 24, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 19 Report and Recommendations dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 6/24/14. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Melissa Stebbins Mundell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry L. Jones
Represented By: Eric R. Gotwalt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]