Cooper v. State of Georgia et al

Defendant: David Lowe, State of Georgia and Carrol Brannen
Plaintiff: Willis Cooper
Case Number: 4:2013cv00091
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Court will grant the 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willis Cooper if the plaintiff can not afford to pay the cost of litigation. Plaintiff must comply within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/22/13. (wwp)
May 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing with prejudice re 1 Complaint filed by Willis Cooper. Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/21/2013. (loh)
May 22, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Willis Cooper. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/21/2013. (loh)
June 11, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 5 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 6/11/2013. (loh)
June 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case with prejudice. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. State of Georgia et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lowe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrol Brannen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]