GRAHAM v. HEAD

Petitioner: ALEXANDER GRAHAM
Respondent: Fredrick Head
Case Number: 4:2013cv00105
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ALEXANDER GRAHAM. The Court directs respondent to file records within twenty one days of the date this Order is served. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/5/2013. (loh)
June 28, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/27/2013. (loh)
September 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing the 1 Petition with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 9/16/13. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. HEAD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALEXANDER GRAHAM
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fredrick Head
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]