DirectTV, LLC v. Shirah et al

Defendant: Panacea of the Islands, Inc. and Herman R. Shirah, Jr.
Plaintiff: DirectTV, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00110
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 18:2511 Wiretapping
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Compel; denying 33 Motion for Protective Order. The parties are ordered to confer, face to face or by telephone, and make a good faith effort to work out these disputes without Court involvement within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/6/2013. (loh)
February 3, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/31/2014. (loh)
March 12, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claim for civil conversion is hereby dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. However, Defendants' request to dismiss Plaintiff's prayer for punitive damages is denied. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/12/2014. (loh)
September 22, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/22/14. (bcw)
May 1, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/1/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DirectTV, LLC v. Shirah et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panacea of the Islands, Inc.
Represented By: William Grey Maston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman R. Shirah, Jr.
Represented By: William Grey Maston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DirectTV, LLC
Represented By: Marla B. Siegel
Represented By: Christian J. Steinmetz, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]