Noel v. Hart et al

Plaintiff: Roman Noel
Defendant: Darrell Hart and David Hewett
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00007
Filed: January 11, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Waycross Office
County: Ware
Referring Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 8 Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Darrell Hart are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/5/2013. (csr)
June 28, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 25 Report and Recommendation, and GRANTING 17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is hereby authorized and directed to enter an appropriate Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/28/2013. (csr)
February 5, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendant Hewitt. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 2/5/2013. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Noel v. Hart et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Noel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Hart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hewett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]