Willis v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Charles Willis
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00089
Filed: September 26, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Charles Willis. Petitioner's in forma pauperis statues on appeal should likewise be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/30/2013. (loh)
January 30, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Charles Willis. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/30/2013. (loh)
February 28, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 13 Report and Recommendations denying the 2255 motion. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 3/1/13. (wwp) Modified on 3/1/2013 (wwp).
June 20, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Charles Willis. Petitioner's in forma pauperis status on appeal should likewise be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/4/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/20/2014. (loh)
June 20, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Charles Willis. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/20/2014. (loh)
July 14, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 37 Report and Recommendations denying Willis' 2255 petition. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 7/14/2014. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Willis v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]