Evans v. United States of America

Petitioner: Wayne Evans
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2013cv00005
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's construed motion for certificate of appealability re 11 Notice of Appeal filed by Wayne Evans. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 5/8/2013. (loh)
December 9, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The Court also denies Evans IFP status on appeal. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 10/9/2014. (loh)
February 14, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Wayne Evans. Petitioner's in forma pauperis status on appeal should likewise be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/14/2013. (loh)
February 14, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Wayne Evans. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/14/2013. (loh)
March 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 2 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 3/6/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wayne Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]