Nez Perce Tribe et al v. US Forest Service

Defendant: US Forest Service
Plaintiff: Nez Perce Tribe and Idaho Rivers United
Intervenor_defendant: Resources Conservation Company International
Amicus: Specialized Carriers & Rigging Association
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00348
Filed: August 8, 2013
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Moscow - Central Office
County: Nez Perce - Central
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE AS DEFENDANT BY APPLICANT-INTERVENOR RESOURCES CONSERVATION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Intervene as Defendant by Applicant-Intervenor Resources Conservation Company International 21 is GRANTED. Defendant-Intervenor Resources Conservation Company International may defer filing an answer toPlaintiffs' Complaint until such time as the Court enters a scheduling order in this matter setting the time for the filing of same. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 12, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion for preliminary injunction 5 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Forest Service issue a Closure Order to Omega-Morgan pursuant to the Forest Services authori ty under 36 U.S.C. § 261.50. The Closure Order shall close Highway 12 between mileposts 74 and 174 to any Omega-Morgan mega-load, and shall remain in place until the Forest Service has conducted itscorridor review and consulted with the Nez Perc e Tribe. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the parties may contact the Court's clerk to set up an evidentiary hearing if necessary. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 1, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Government's Motion to Stay 51 is GRANTED, and all time limits and deadlines in this case with the one exception listed below - are extended for a period of time equal to the duration of the lapse in appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 10, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 47 Expedited Motion for Reconsideration; denying 50 Government's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
December 18, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation 74 is APPROVED. Defendant-Intervenor Resources Conservation Company International (RCCI) is and shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nez Perce Tribe et al v. US Forest Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Forest Service
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nez Perce Tribe
Represented By: Michael Anthony Lopez
Represented By: David J Cummings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Rivers United
Represented By: Natalie Jane Havlina
Represented By: Bryan Jack Hurlbutt
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Resources Conservation Company International
Represented By: Richard C Boardman
Represented By: Erika Eaton Malmen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Specialized Carriers & Rigging Association
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]