Valbruna Slater Steel Corporation et al v. Joslyn Manufacturing Company et al

Plaintiff: Valbruna Slater Steel Corporation and Fort Wayne Steel Corporation
Defendant: Joslyn Manufacturing Company, Joslyn Corporation and Joslyn Manufacturing Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00044
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Allen
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: Comprehensive Env Response, Compensation & Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Joslyn Manufacturing Company LLC (converted to a Motion for Summary Judgment). The Motion is GRANTED with respect to Count II of theComplaint and DENIED with respect to Counts I and III of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/11/11. (cer)
March 21, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joslyn Manufacturing Company LLC; DENYING 47 RULE 56 MOTION to Strike filed by Fort Wayne Steel Corporation, Valbruna Slater Steel Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/21/13. (lhc)
July 24, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 60 MOTION for Reconsideration re 58 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Counter Claimant Joslyn Manufacturing Company LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 7/24/13. (lhc)
September 11, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 67 MOTION (Joint) for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Fort Wayne Steel Corporation, Valbruna Slater Steel Corporation, Defendants Joslyn Corporation, Joslyn Manufacturing Company, Joslyn Manufacturing Company LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 9/11/13. (cer)
July 18, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 73 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Certain Case Management Deadlines by Defendant Joslyn Manufacturing Company LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 7/18/2014. (lhc) Modified on 7/18/2014 to modify text(lhc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valbruna Slater Steel Corporation et al v. Joslyn Manufacturing Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valbruna Slater Steel Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Reeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Wayne Steel Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Reeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joslyn Manufacturing Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joslyn Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joslyn Manufacturing Company LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]