Entertainment USA Inc v. Moorehead Communications Inc

Plaintiff: Entertainment USA Inc
Defendant: Moorehead Communications Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv00116
Filed: April 9, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Grant
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Rudy Lozano
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 17 MOTION (Joint) for Protective Order by Defendant Moorehead Communications Inc. The parties may submit a revised protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 6/26/12. (cer)
October 19, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 21 Amended Joint Motion for a Protective Order filed by Moorehead Communications Inc, Entertainment USA Inc. The parties may submit a revised protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 10/19/2012. (lns)
May 2, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 31 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendant Moorehead Communications Inc. Plaintiff ORDERED to execute by 5/16/2013 an affidavit or declaration as outlined in Opinion and Order. Plaintiff REMINDED that Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(e)(1) requires a party to supplement or correct its discovery responses in a timely manner if it learns that it is incomplete or incorrect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 5/2/13. (cer)
June 3, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 42 MOTION (Joint) for Protective Order (Third Amended) by Plaintiff Entertainment USA Inc, Defendant Moorehead Communications Inc. The parties may submit a revised protective order consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 6/3/13. (cer)
September 20, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 59 MOTION (Second) to Compel Discovery and to Extend Deadline for 30(b)(6) Depositions by Plaintiff Entertainment USA Inc. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART in that Moorehead Communications Inc is ORDERED to produce the requested i nformation concerning Josh LaFevre, Phan Tran and Miguel Rivera. The Motion is DENIED with respect to Entertainment USA Inc's request that information be produced in Excel rather than in PDF. The Motion is otherwise DENIED AS MOOT. The Court DENIES AS MOOT 63 MOTION for In-Camera Review and Protective Order by Defendant Moorehead Communications Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 9/20/13. (cer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entertainment USA Inc v. Moorehead Communications Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entertainment USA Inc
Represented By: Jason M Kuchmay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moorehead Communications Inc
Represented By: Steven L Jackson
Represented By: Kevin J Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]