Malibu Media LLC v. Does 1-14

Plaintiff: Malibu Media LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-14
Case Number: 1:2012cv00263
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER SEVERING all remaining Dfts from this case with the exception of Doe No 6. Clerk DIRECTED to sever all claims against Doe Dfts No 5,9, and 12; to treat the claims against those Dfts as separate claims; and to assign them to Chief Ju dge Philip P Simon and the undersigned Magistrate Judge with a separate docket number for each action. Pla DIRECTED to file separate Amended Complaints containing only its claims against each Dft. The Court by separate order is vacating the requireme nt that Pla not use any Doe Dft's real name and accordingly the Amended Complaints directed to be filed shall use the Dft's real name. The stay previously imposed is hereby lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 5/21/2013. (lns)
May 21, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Pla granted leave to use any Doe Dft's real name in an Amended Complaint or other publicly filed communication from this point forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 5/21/2013. (lns)
December 3, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 12 MOTION to Quash by Defendant John Does 1-14; 13 MOTION to Sever John Doe #6 by Defendant John Does 1-14; 17 MOTION to Sever of John Doe No. 7 by Defendant John Does 1-14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 12/3/12. (cer)
December 10, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 24 Motion to Sever for Misjoinder, MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena by Defendant John Doe 12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 12/10/2012. (lns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media LLC v. Does 1-14
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media LLC
Represented By: Paul J Nicoletti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-14
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]