Marion T LLC v. Formall Inc

Defendant: Thermoforming Machinery & Equipment Inc
Plaintiff: Marion T LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00456
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Grant
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Marion T LLC. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2013 at 09:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey. Court will initiate call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 12/5/13. (cer)
July 17, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court reforms the agreement of the parties as outlined in Order. Clerk DIRECTED to enter final judgment in favor of Thermoforming Machinery & Equipment Inc and against Marion T LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 7/17/14. (cer)
December 28, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 1 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Marion T LLC; 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Thermoforming Machinery & Equipment Inc. Plaintiff ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint as outlined in Order by 1/11/2013. Defendant ORDERED to file an Amended Notice of Removal as outlined in Order by 1/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 12/28/12. (cer)
November 20, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Pleading and to Submit Counterclaim by Defendant Formall Inc. Clerk DIRECTED to show Defendant's Amended Answer as filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 11/20/14. (cer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion T LLC v. Formall Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermoforming Machinery & Equipment Inc
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion T LLC
Represented By: H. Joseph Certain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.