Fowler et al v. New Werner Co et al

Defendant: New Werner Holding Co LLC, New Werner Co, Lowe's Companies Inc and Lowe's Home Centers Inc
Plaintiff: Jerry J Fowler and Michele Fowler
Case Number: 1:2013cv00126
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Fort Wayne Office
County: Steuben
Referring Judge: Roger B Cosbey
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Jerry J Fowler, Michele Fowler. Plaintiffs ORDERED to supplement the record by filing a Second Amended Complaint by 6/7/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 5/24/13. (cer)
November 5, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 38 MOTION (Joint) for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Jerry J Fowler, Michele Fowler, Defendants Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowe's Home Centers Inc, New Werner Co, New Werner Holding Co Inc, New Werner Holding Co LLC, Werner Co. d/b/a New Werner Co. The parties may, however, submit a revised protective order that cures the identified deficiencies and is consistent with the requirements of Rule 26(c) and Seventh Circuit case law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roger B Cosbey on 11/5/13. (cer)
June 10, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 31 MOTION (Partial) to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lowe's Home Centers Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc. The Motion is GRANTED with respect to the Plaintiffs' claims that assert common law theories of negligence, gross negligence, or recklessness and a post-sale duty to warn. The Motion is DENIED with respect to the Plaintiffs' Indiana Consumer Protection Act claim and Indiana Product Liability Act strict liability claim. The Plaintiffs' other Product Liability Act claims remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/10/14. (cer)
September 18, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants New Werner Co, New Werner Holding Co Inc, New Werner Holding Co LLC, Werner Co. d/b/a New Werner Co. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/2014. (lhc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler et al v. New Werner Co et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Werner Holding Co LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Werner Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry J Fowler
Represented By: Malcolm B Futhey, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Fowler
Represented By: Malcolm B Futhey, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]