Means v. Ameriquest Mortgage Company et al

 
Case Number: 2:2006cv00409
Filed: December 8, 2006
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's Second 95 Motion to Restore Case to Trial Docket, the Plaintiff's Third 96 Motion to Amend Complaint, and the Defendants' 111 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Restore Case to Trial Docket and to Plaintiff's Motion to File a Third-Amended Complaint are DENIED. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 11/24/09. (sda) (Modified TO ADD THE WORD OPINION on 11/25/2009) (sda).
March 17, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 122 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Amend Complaint. Court DENIES AS MOOT 121 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/17/2011. (tc)
January 27, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 54 the Objection to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Discovery Cut Off Deadline and Motion to Reconsider Order Dated 11/21/2011. The plaintiff is not required to respond to the defendants untimely discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/27/2012. (tc)
October 9, 2012 194 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 155 Defendant Deutsche Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTS 158 Defendant Ameriquest Mortgage Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/9/2012. (tc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Means v. Ameriquest Mortgage Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]