Abrams v. DLA Piper US LLP

Debtor: Heartland Memorial Hospital LLC
Defendant: DLA Piper US LLP
Plaintiff: David Abrams
Case Number: 2:2012cv00019
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: the Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss Counts V and VI of Second Amended Complaint DE [17-2 at 5456]. Counts V and VI are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with leave to re-file within fourteen days of the date of this Opinion and Order. If the Plaintiffs do not amend their pleadings within fourteen days, this dismissal of Counts V and VI will become final and with prejudice. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/12/13. (mc)
July 9, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 23 DLA Piper's Motion to Dismiss Counts V And VI Of Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/9/14. (kjp)
May 15, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/15/12. (mc)
August 28, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/28/12. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. DLA Piper US LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Heartland Memorial Hospital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLA Piper US LLP
Represented By: Martin O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Abrams
Represented By: Mark E Leipold PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.