Hogge v. USA

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Jonathan Hogge
Case Number: 2:2012cv00135
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 1 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) is DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice. Court DECLINE to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 9/5/13. cc: Hogge(mc)
August 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 25 Motion to Stay decision on his motions pending the outcome of his appeal. Hogge's Reply to be filed by 9/3/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 8/21/14. cc: Hogge (mc)
January 5, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Federal Public Defender is ORDERED to appoint counsel to represent Hogge at a new evidentiary hearing. Appointed counsel for Hogge and counsel for the government are ORDERED to appear for an evidentiary hearing on the Section 2 255 motion on May 19, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Philip P Simon. Following motions are denied: 28 Motion for Bond, 19 Motion to Vacate Lien/Levy and 20 Motion to Vacate the restitution order as to Jonathan Hogge. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 1/5/15. cc: Hogge, FPD

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogge v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Hogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]