Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Kingkade et al

Defendant: Winston Kingkade, John B Kingkade, Howard C Kingkade, JBK and TRK
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00212
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: Hammond Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul R Cherry
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Minnesota Life's 14 Motion remains UNDER ADVISEMENT pending completion of the filings set forth in this order. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 1/27/2014. (tc)
March 5, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting Minnesota Lifes 14 Motion to Dismiss; as Minnesota Life is no longer an interested party in this action, the court will grant their requested dismissal. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 3/5/14. (mc)
July 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING re 30 MOTION for Default Judgment. Case is deferred to Magistrate Judge Roger B. Cosbey for mediation. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 7/29/14. (eml)Text Modified on 7/29/2014 (eml).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Kingkade et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Kingkade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Kingkade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard C Kingkade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]