G&S Metal Consultants Inc v. Continental Casualty Company

Plaintiff: G&S Metal Consultants Inc
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00493
Filed: October 9, 2009
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: St. Joseph
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART 92 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as detailed by this opinion. The 80 MOTION for Discovery Sanctions and the 95 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision by a District Judge re 92 REPORT AN D RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Continental Casualty Company are DENIED, and instead re-opens discovery for a period of time to be determined by the magistrate judge, pursuant to the limitations in this opinion. The 142 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery Sanctions filed by Continental Casualty Company is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 9/10/2013. (saj)
November 12, 2013 168 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 96 MOTION for leave to file an Amended Answer filed by Continental Casualty Company. Defendant ordered to FILE the Amended Answer upon receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/12/13. (smp)
November 15, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 113 Motion for Discovery. Court orders parties to confer in advance of the 11/21/13 scheduling conference and FILE by 12:00 Noon on 11/20/13, a Joint Proposed Discovery plan, noting briefly any disagreements, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/15/13. (smp)
January 15, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 174 Motion to Compel. Court orders Defendant Continental Casualty Company to pay Plaintiff G & S Metal Consultants Inc's reasonable expenses incurred in responding to this motion, including attorney fees. Court orders Plaintiff to file a verified statement of expenses with supporting documentation on or before 2/3/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 1/15/14. (smp) Modified on 1/16/2014 to correct document type (smp).
June 25, 2014 198 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant to Answer Discovery and Produce Witnesses for Deposition 187 . The Court ORDERS Defendant Continental Casualty Company to serve the discovery responses ordered in this motion on or before July 18, 2014. The Court ORDERS the parties to confer on or before July 2, 2014, to set a date for the depositions of Joseph Nalepa and Jack Conrad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/25/2014. (rmn)
September 8, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 199 Motion to Strike Expert Report of Jim Leatzow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/8/2014. (rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: G&S Metal Consultants Inc v. Continental Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&S Metal Consultants Inc
Represented By: Thao Trong Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: James M Hoey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]