Cantu v. USA

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Antonio Cantu
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00181
Filed: April 13, 2012
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: LaPorte
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 14 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 Motion for Certificate of Appealability and DENYING leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/12. (smp)(cc: Cantu)
September 20, 2012 1 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255): The court SUMMARILY DISMISSES his petition filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/20/12. (jld) Modified on 9/20/2012 to correct title to Opinion and Order (jld).
November 26, 2012 9 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/26/12. (jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cantu v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Cantu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]