Unverferth Mfg Co Inc v. Par-Kan Co

Plaintiff: Unverferth Mfg Co Inc
Defendant: Par-Kan Co
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00097
Filed: February 12, 2013
 
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: Kosciusko
Referring Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Unverferth Mfg Co Inc. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/11/2013. (lyb)
May 27, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss Defendants inequitable conduct counterclaim and to strike Defendant's inequitable conduct affirmative defense. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/27/14. (jld)
September 12, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court being duly advised of the settlement between the parties VACATES the hearing scheduled for Monday September 15, 2014 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/12/2014. (rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Unverferth Mfg Co Inc v. Par-Kan Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unverferth Mfg Co Inc
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par-Kan Co
Represented By: Mark Donald Boveri
Represented By: Michael D Marston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]