ABM Janitorial Services-North Central, Inc. v. PAMI Ryan Town Centre LLC et al

Plaintiff: ABM Janitorial Services-North Central, Inc
Defendant: PAMI Ryan Town Centre LLC and Ryan Town Centre LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv00100
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant PAMI Ryan Town Centre LLC's Motion to Dismiss Application for Appointment of Receiver (docket no. 11 in case no. 08-CV-123-LRR) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 10/22/2008. (de)
October 31, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Application for Receiver filed by J.E.M.M. of Pinellas, Inc. d/b/a Bay Area Disaster Kleenup (BADK) in member case C 08-123 at docket no. 2-5. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 10/31/2008. (de)
September 11, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 84 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Clerk of Court is directed to detach and separately file the Consent Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 9/11/2009. (pac)
December 3, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion for Approval of Receiver's Fee; granting 91 Motion for Termination of Receivership; granting 92 Motion for Relief from a Judgment. Parties see text of order for specifics. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 12/3/2009. (Copy to Todd Barker) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABM Janitorial Services-North Central, Inc. v. PAMI Ryan Town Centre LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABM Janitorial Services-North Central, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMI Ryan Town Centre LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Town Centre LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.