Scorpiniti v. Fox Television Studios Inc

Plaintiff: Louis J Scorpiniti
Defendant: Fox Television Studios Inc
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00064
Filed: June 16, 2011
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. Scorpiniti's request that it be given 90 days in which to conduct discovery into jurisdictional issues is denied. Deadline for Scorpiniti to respond to Fox's motion to dismiss is extended to 2/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/2/2012. (pac)
August 31, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss; granting 27 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 8/31/2012. (pac)
November 26, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim for Failure to State a Claim (see text of Order for details). Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 11/26/2012. (skm)
January 23, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Counts I, II and III of 15 Complaint are dismissed. Scorpiniti's service mark THE GATE, US Reg 3,536,556, is cancelled. Counterclaim II is dismissed as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to t erminate 71 Motion in Limine and 72 Motion in Limine as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Fox Television Studios, Inc and against Plaintiff Louis J Scorpiniti, release the trial date and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 1/23/2013. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Scorpiniti v. Fox Television Studios Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis J Scorpiniti
Represented By: Timothy J Zarley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Television Studios Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]