Krier v. Iowa Department of Corrections et al

Defendant: Dr Deol, John Baldwin, John Fayram, Jerry Connelly and Iowa Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Sean Edward Krier
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00013
Filed: February 26, 2013
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Jones
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sean Edward Krier. The clerks office is directed to file the complaint (docket no. 1-1) without the prepayment of the filing fee. The plaintiff is directed to submit an initi al partial filing fee of $9.81 by no later than 5/22/13. The clerks office is directed to dismiss without prejudice this action, unless either the initial partial filing fee of $9.81 is received by 5/22/13 or the court grants an enlargement of time to pay the initial partial filing feein response to a written motion. The institution having custody of the plaintiff is directed to collect and remit monthly payments until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The clerks office is d irected to send a copy of this order and the notice of collection of filing fee to the appropriate official at the place where the plaintiff is an inmate. The court reserves ruling on the plaintiff's claims for purposes of 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B) and/or 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 4/23/13. (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf and Warden; CRF)
July 22, 2013 8 Featured Case INITIAL Review Order to File and Serve: The Iowa Department of Corrections, John Baldwin, John Fayram and Dr. Deol are dismissed from this action. The clerks office is directed to serve the complaint on the remaining defendants and mail a copy of th e complaint to the Iowa Attorney General without the prepayment of fees and costs. A copy of this order is to accompany the documents being served. The Iowa Attorney General is directed to notify the court immediately if he lacks the consent of the r emaining defendants to appear generally on their behalf and submit to the jurisdiction of the court. The remaining defendants are directed to file an answer or other dispositive motion by no later than 8/22/13. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 7/22/13. (ksy)(Copy w/NEF to Plf; copy of Complaint, Order and NEF mailed to remaining defendants and IA Attorney General) Modified text on 7/22/2013 (ksy)
August 1, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 5 Pro Se Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Partial Filing Fee and denying 6 Pro Se Motion to Reconsider 3 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 7/31/2013 (copy w/NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Krier v. Iowa Department of Corrections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Deol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fayram
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Connelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Edward Krier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]