United States of America v. Wheeler et al

Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Duwayne Wheeler and Linda J. Wheeler
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00070
Filed: July 12, 2013
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER: The court dismisses defendant Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., without prejudice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 10/23/2013 (copy w/NEF mailed to Dft Linda Wheeler). (skm)
June 10, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Pro Se Motion to Set Aside Order re 22 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The 23 Final Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure and 24 Judgment are hereby set aside. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment must be filed not later than 7/1/2014. Plaintiff's reply, if any, must be filed not later than 7/11/2014. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 6/10/2014 (copy w/NEF mailed to Dft Wheeler). (skm)
July 16, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. The United States is directed to submit an appropriate judgment to the Court for approval. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 7/16/2014. (NEF and order mailed to pro se party) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Wheeler et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duwayne Wheeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda J. Wheeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew J Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]