Bear et al v. Dietch et al

Plaintiff: Archie Bear, Duane Yates, Alex Tejeda, Tahjah Shepard, Michael Ferguson and All Other Similarly Situated Individuals
Defendant: Tracy Dietch, John Fayram, John Baldwin, Cindy Wolmutt, Richard Jenkins, Sheryl Dahm, Steven Salviati, Thomas Miller and All Other Unnamed Individuals
Case Number: 1:2014cv00005
Filed: January 16, 2014
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Jones
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 1/9/2015. (NEF/order mailed to pro se parties) (pac)
March 23, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 112 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment and denying 113 Motion for Enlarged Ruling re 103 Judgment. See text of Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 3/23/15. (copy w/nef mailed to non-ecf parties) (djs)
July 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Pro Se Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 7/7/2014 (copy w/NEF mailed to Plts). (skm)
August 20, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Pro Se Motion for Clarification re 33 Notice of Dismissal, filed by Duane Yates. This case will not be dismissed. The 38 Pro Se Motion to Set Trial Date filed by Duane Yates is denied, however, discovery is due by 10/20 /2014 and dispositive motions, if any, must be filed not later than 11/20/2014. Plaintiffs' jury demand, as contained in their motion to set trial date, is stricken as untimely. The 40 Pro Se Renewed Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Duane Yates is denied. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 8/19/2014 (copy w/NEF mailed to Plts). (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bear et al v. Dietch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Bear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Tejeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahjah Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Other Similarly Situated Individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Dietch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fayram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Wolmutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Dahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Salviati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Other Unnamed Individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]