Pfab v. United Wisconsin Insurance Company d/b/a United Heartland

Plaintiff: Marshalle Pfab
Defendant: United Wisconsin Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv01024
Filed: October 7, 2010
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Dubuque Office
County: Dubuque
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 12/22/2011. (Stigler, Karo)
March 13, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion in Limine (see text of Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 3/13/2012. (skm)
January 11, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Remand to State Court (see text of Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 01/11/2011. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfab v. United Wisconsin Insurance Company d/b/a United Heartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshalle Pfab
Represented By: Les V Reddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Wisconsin Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.