United States of America v. Reed et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael Reed, Loren Brown and John Sheridan
 
Case Number: 5:2007cv04087
Filed: October 3, 2007
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Dickinson
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Paul A Zoss
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Denying 68 Pro Se Motion for Summary Judgment - Granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment (See text of order). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/23/09. (This order is amended only as to the spelling of Defendant Reed's name in the caption of the document) (Copy with NEF to non-ECF parties) (kfs)
March 23, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - Plaintiff United States of America recover from Defendant Michael Alan Reed the amount of $726,826.37 for those income tax liabilities, associated penalties and interest plus statutory additions accruing from August 12, 2008 - It is a lso ordered that Defendant Michael Alan Reed's federal tax liens be foreclosed on the following real and personal property: (1) The 255th Avenue Property; (2) The 19th Street Property; (3) 1947 red Indian Chief motorcycle; (4) 1974 red and white GMC truck; (5) 2002 black/red Indian Chief motorcycle; (6) 2001 blue Ford pick-up; (7) 1991 red Harley-Davidson motorcycle; (8) 2004 silver Toyota Sequoia; and (9) 1971 white Fan motorhome; and the sale of that real and personal property. Signed by Clerk and approved by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/23/09. (Copy with NEF to non-ECF parties) (kfs)
February 16, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 141 Motion For Relief From 106 Order of Sale and plaintiff is authorized to conduct a public sale of four vehicles (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 2/16/2010. (copy w/nef to non-ecf parties) (des).
October 27, 2008 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Default Judgment as to Michael Reed as trustee, John Sheridan as trustee, Steve Nelson as trustee, and Ray Cox as trustee (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/27/08. (copy w/nef to pro se filers) (des)
March 23, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Denying 68 Pro Se Motion for Summary Judgment - Granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment (See text of order). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/23/09. (Copy with NEF to non-ECF parties) (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Reed et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John R Monroe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sheridan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]