Smithco Manufacturing Inc v. Haldex Brake Products Corporation

Plaintiff: Smithco Manufacturing Inc
Defendant: Haldex Brake Products Corporation
 
Case Number: 5:2009cv04016
Filed: February 24, 2009
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: Plymouth
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Paul A Zoss
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Haldex Brake Products Corporation (See Order Text). Set Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Defendant file supplemental brief by 3/25/2010; Plaintiff file supplemental response by 4/1/2010; Defendant file any brief in reply by 4/8/2010. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 3/11/2010. (des)
March 24, 2010 39 Featured Case ORDER - Granting 38 Resisted Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Negligence Claim filed by SmithCo Manufacturing Inc., the plaintiff's negligence claim is dismissed with prejudice. Furthermore, the supplemental briefing required by the court's Order (docket 37 ), filed March 11, 2010, is now moot, and the parties are no longer required to file any supplemental briefs. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/24/2010. (src).
April 5, 2010 45 Featured Case ORDER denying 40 SmithCo's Motion to Amend its Complaint. See order text for details. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Paul A Zoss on 04/05/2010. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smithco Manufacturing Inc v. Haldex Brake Products Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smithco Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: Charles T Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haldex Brake Products Corporation
Represented By: Laura N Martino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]