Hagen v. Siouxland Obstetrics & Gynecology, PC et al

Defendant: Kimberly A Lief, MD, Siouxland Obstetrics and Gynecology, PC, Paul J Eastman, MD, Tauhni T Hunt, MD and Angela J Aldrich, MD
Plaintiff: Edward P Hagen, DO
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv04047
Filed: May 19, 2011
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Sioux
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Paul A Zoss
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 140 Featured Case ORDER Certifying Questions to the Iowa Supreme Court - I find certification is appropriate in this case, even post-judgment. I hereby certify the questions stated earlier to the Iowa Supreme Court. The Clerk shall forward this order to the Iowa Supreme Court under official seal as required under Iowa Code Section 684A.4. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/29/13. (certified copy mailed to Iowa Supreme Court) (djs)
May 30, 2014 157 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The stay previously imposed is lifted. Defendants' 119 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a new trial are denied. Hagen's 121 motion for an additur is denied and 121 motion for pre- and post -judgment interest is granted. Prejudgment interest shall accrue from May 19, 2011, at the rate identified in Iowa Code Section 668.13(3). Post-judgment interest shall be calculated from May 2, 2013, at the rate identified in 28 USC Section 1961. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/30/14. (djs)
July 15, 2014 167 Featured Case ORDER granting 163 MOTION to Stay 158 Judgment. Any action to enforce or collect upon the judgment in favor of Plaintiff is hereby stayed pending the Eighth Circuit Court of Appealss decision in this case. Within three business days of the date of this order, Defendants shall deposit the original version of the letter of credit (docket no. 163-1) with the Clerk of Court. The Clerk shall hold the letter of credit deposited by Defendants until further order of this court. After the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals issues its opinion in this case, and if the judgment in favor of Plaintiff survives appeal, any party may seek to lift this stay by filing a motion in this court. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 7/15/14. (djs)
December 7, 2012 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Quash Subpoena by St Lukes Reg Medical Center by Defendant Siouxland Obstetrics and Gynecology PC (See Order Text). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/7/2012. (des)
March 20, 2013 74 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment: Denying 59 Motion to Strike: See text of Order for further details. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/20/13. (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hagen v. Siouxland Obstetrics & Gynecology, PC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Lief, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siouxland Obstetrics and Gynecology, PC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J Eastman, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tauhni T Hunt, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela J Aldrich, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward P Hagen, DO
Represented By: Stanley E Munger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]