Wilkins v. Ludwick et al

Respondent: Department of Corrections, Nick Ludwick and State of Iowa
Petitioner: Omar R Wilkins
Case Number: 5:2013cv04024
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Omar R Wilkins. Petitioner's 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is granted. Clerk's office is directed to appoint an attorney to represent the petitioner in this matter. Clerk's off ice is directed to send a copy of the application for a writ of habeas corpus by certified mail to the respondent and the Iowa Attorney General. The respondent is directed to file an answer to the application for a writ of habeas corpus by no later than 4/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 3/22/13. (copy w/nef mailed to petitioner; copy to CJA Panel Administrator; copy w/petition via certified mail to Respondent Ludwick and IA Attorney General) (djs)
July 21, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Wilkins's 19 MOTION to Expand Record and 20 MOTION to to Add Supplemental Claim are denied. Respondent's 40 MOTION to Strike 39 Pro Se Petitioners Reply Brief is granted in part and denied in part. That brief is hereby deemed stricken to the extent it addresses issues not raised in the briefs filed by Wilkins's counsel. I respectfully recommend that Wilkins's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/21/14. (djs)
October 6, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Accepting 45 Report and Recommendation On Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 2254 to deny Wilkins petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 2254; granting 51 Motion to Strike to the extent that I have not considered Wilkin's pro se Objections. See order text for details. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/06/2014. Order/NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Ludwick et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nick Ludwick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Iowa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Omar R Wilkins
Represented By: Christopher Cooklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]