Robles-Garcia v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: German Robles-Garcia
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv04031
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: Woodbury
Presiding Judge: Mark W Bennett
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2013 13 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying in its entirety 4 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) (CR10-4011-MWB). This matter is dismissed in its entirety. No certificate of appealability will issue for any claim or contention in this case. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/11/2013. (src)
March 11, 2014 17 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order denying 16 Pro Se Motion to Reconsider 13 Memorandum Opinion and Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) (CR10-4011-MWB), and 14 Judgment on Habeas Corpus Petition (See Order Text). No certificate of appealability will issue for any claim or contention in his Motion For Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 3/11/2014. (copy w/nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
June 3, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Pro Se Motion for Certificate of Appealability. No certificate of appealability will issue for any claim or contention in his Section 2255 Motion or his Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/2/14. (copy w/nef mailed to pro se filer) (djs)
July 16, 2014 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order denying 29 Pro Se Motion To Vacate Order Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(1)(3)(4)(6). No certificate of appealability will issue for any claim or contention in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 7/16/2014. (copy w/nef to non-ecf filer) (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robles-Garcia v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: John H Lammers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: German Robles-Garcia
Represented By: Douglas L Roehrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]